Date | Issuer | Insider | Transaction | Amount | New Balance ⓘ
The balance of securities held by registered holder at the time of the transaction. Insiders may direct multiple registered holders and hold multiple security types.
|
|
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Filed 2020-12-18 11:24 Tx date 2020-12-11 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Jason Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
7,890,512 | ||
Filed 2020-12-18 11:19 Tx date 2020-12-11 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Jason Peter
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Astro 1 Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
297,619 | ||
Filed 2020-12-18 10:40 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Astro 1 Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
297,619 | ||
Filed 2020-01-06 16:49 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Astro 1 Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-09-21 09:59 Tx date 2020-09-18 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,512
+60,000 vol $0.1252 each |
364,167 | |
Filed 2020-09-17 19:37 Tx date 2020-09-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,420
+36,000 vol $0.1228 each |
140,167 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:56 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:53 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
McHardy, Richard Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:51 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:47 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+250,000 vol |
250,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:45 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-08 14:39 Tx date 2019-08-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+1,000,000 vol |
1,000,000 | |
Filed 2020-06-04 11:15 Tx date 2020-06-04 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,250
+25,000 vol $0.13 each |
726,667 | |
Filed 2020-06-01 10:50 Tx date 2020-05-29 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$4,132
+28,500 vol $0.145 each |
701,667 | |
Filed 2020-06-01 10:49 Tx date 2020-05-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,650
+10,000 vol $0.165 each |
673,167 | |
Filed 2020-06-01 10:49 Tx date 2020-05-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$3,200
+20,000 vol $0.16 each |
663,167 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:29 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:28 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-28 13:23 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
McHardy, Richard Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:20 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
McHardy, Richard Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-28 13:17 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+300,000 vol |
300,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:16 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-28 13:08 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+500,000 vol |
500,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:06 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-28 13:03 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+850,000 vol |
850,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 13:02 Tx date 2018-06-28 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-28 12:58 Tx date 2020-05-27 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
50 - Grant of options
|
+850,000 vol |
850,000 | |
Filed 2020-05-28 12:51 Tx date 2018-08-08 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Options
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
|||
Filed 2020-05-21 16:09 Tx date 2020-05-21 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$1,300
+10,000 vol $0.13 each |
643,167 | |
Filed 2020-05-21 14:59 Tx date 2020-05-20 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
10 - Acquisition or disposition in the public market
|
$7,980
+66,500 vol $0.12 each |
633,167 | |
Filed 2020-01-07 12:46 Tx date 2020-01-07 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+4,015,152 vol |
12,139,250 | |
Filed 2020-01-06 16:49 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Astro 1 Holdings Ltd. (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
357,143 | ||
Filed 2019-09-17 14:10 Tx date 2019-07-08 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
11 - Acquisition or disposition carried out privately
|
+5,757,576 vol |
8,124,098 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:47 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Mottahed, Shahin (Sonny)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,933,333 vol |
586,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:46 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Mottahed, Shahin (Sonny)
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,933,333 vol |
586,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:44 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ryan Hozjan (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-250,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:43 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Kylie Hozjan (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-250,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:42 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,833,333 vol |
566,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:41 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,833,333 vol |
566,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:40 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Ryan Hozjan (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-250,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:39 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Hozjan, Ronald Steve
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: Kylie Hozjan (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-250,000 vol |
50,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:36 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-104,167 vol |
20,833 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:35 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-41,667 vol |
8,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:34 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,104,167 vol |
420,833 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:33 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Zunich Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,000,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:32 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Theresa Zunich (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-583,333 vol |
116,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:31 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ronald Zunich (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-416,667 vol |
83,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:27 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-520,833 vol |
104,167 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:27 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-208,333 vol |
41,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:26 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,520,833 vol |
304,167 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:25 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Zunich Family Trust (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,000,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:24 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Theresa Zunich (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-583,333 vol |
116,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:22 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Zunich, Theodore Sebastian
4 - Director of Issuer, 5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Ronald Zunich (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-416,667 vol |
83,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:20 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-958,333 vol |
191,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:20 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-4,166,667 vol |
833,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:18 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 761842 Alberta Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,208,333 vol |
641,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:17 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-958,333 vol |
191,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:16 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: RRSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-4,166,667 vol |
833,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:15 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Miller, James Harold
4 - Director of Issuer
Holder: 761842 Alberta Ltd. (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,208,333 vol |
641,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:13 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
McHardy, Richard Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,916,667 vol |
1,583,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:11 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
McHardy, Richard Francis
4 - Director of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-7,916,667 vol |
1,583,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:06 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-333,333 vol |
66,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:04 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,416,667 vol |
483,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:03 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RESP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-416,667 vol |
83,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:02 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Lorne E. Bunch-RSP (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,333,333 vol |
666,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 17:01 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Lorne E. Bunch (Control or Direction)
|
Warrants
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,000,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:57 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: TFSA (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-333,333 vol |
66,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:56 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RSP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-2,416,667 vol |
483,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:55 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: RESP (Indirect Ownership)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-416,667 vol |
83,333 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:54 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Lorne E. Bunch-RSP (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-3,333,333 vol |
666,667 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:51 Tx date 2019-06-17 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Bunch, Stephanie Ann
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Holder: Lorne E. Bunch (Control or Direction)
|
Common Shares
37 - Stock split or consolidation
|
-1,000,000 vol |
200,000 | |
Filed 2019-06-27 16:06 Tx date 2019-06-13 |
$YSS
YSS Corp. (formerly, Solo Growth Corp.) |
Balakas, Anthony Philip
5 - Senior Officer of Issuer
Direct Ownership
|
Common Shares
00 - Opening Balance-Initial SEDI Report
|
2,366,522 |